House | 05/26/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4343 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 3785 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3785 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3574 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 997 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 997 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 621 | |
Senate | 03/27/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |