Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2022 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Campbell S.B. No. 2022
 (In the Senate - Filed March 30, 2015; April 1, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 18, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2022 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Driftwood Economic Development Municipal
 Management District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 3858.052, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 3858.052.  APPOINTMENT OF DIRECTORS. The board
 consists of the following directors:
 (1)  Position 1:  a person appointed by the
 commissioners court;
 (2)  Position 2:  a person appointed by the
 commissioners court;
 (3)  Position 3:  a person appointed by the city
 council;
 (4)  Position 4:  a person appointed by the city
 council; and
 (5)  Position 5:  a person appointed by the
 commissioners court, who must be the individual, the designee of
 the individual, or the designee of the entity that [who] owns more
 property in the district than any other individual or entity,
 except that if the commissioners court is unable to identify a
 qualified person [qualified for Position 5] who is willing and able
 to serve, the commissioners court shall appoint to the place a
 person who is:
 (A)  at least 18 years old; and
 (B)  a resident of this state.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 3858, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3858.057 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 3858.057.  QUALIFICATIONS OF DIRECTORS; PARTICIPATION
 IN VOTING. (a)  Sections 375.063 and 375.072, Local Government
 Code, do not apply to a director.
 (b)  An official or employee of a public entity may serve on
 the board.  The common law doctrine of incompatibility does not
 disqualify an official or employee of a public entity from serving
 as a director.
 (c)  A person appointed to serve on the board under this
 chapter is qualified to serve as a director and participate in all
 votes pertaining to the business of the district regardless of any
 other statutory provision to the contrary.
 (d)  A director may participate in discussion and vote on an
 action even if the director is an official or employee of a public
 entity and the action relates to assessments on or contracts with
 the public entity.
 SECTION 3.  Section 3858.102(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The district may provide, or it may enter into contracts
 with a governmental or private entity to provide, the following
 types of improvement projects or services or activities in support
 of or incidental to those projects or services:
 (1)  the planning, design, construction, improvement,
 operation, and maintenance of:
 (A)  irrigation facilities and landscaping;
 (B)  highway right-of-way or transit corridor
 beautification and improvement;
 (C)  lighting, banners, and signs;
 (D)  a street or sidewalk;
 (E)  a hiking or cycling path or trail;
 (F)  a park, lake, garden, recreational facility,
 sports facility, open space, scenic area, animal habitat, or
 related exhibit or preserve;
 (G)  a fountain, plaza, or pedestrian mall;
 (H)  a drainage or storm-water detention
 improvement;
 (I)  a wastewater treatment and disposal
 facility;
 (J)  water, wastewater, or drainage facilities or
 services;
 (K)  a water quality protection facility;
 (L) [(K)]  a facility to enhance groundwater
 recharge, including a rainwater collection and harvesting system;
 (M) [(L)]  an alternative energy facility; or
 (N) [(M)]  solid waste management services,
 including garbage collection, recycling, and composting;
 (2)  the planning, design, construction, acquisition,
 lease, rental, improvement, maintenance, installation, and
 management of and provision of furnishings for a facility for:
 (A)  a conference, convention, or exhibition;
 (B)  a manufacturer, consumer, or trade show;
 (C)  a civic, community, or institutional event;
 or
 (D)  an exhibit, display, attraction, special
 event, or seasonal or cultural celebration or holiday; or
 (3)  a special or supplemental service for the
 improvement and promotion of the district or for the protection of
 public health and safety in the district, including:
 (A)  advertising;
 (B)  promotion;
 (C)  tourism;
 (D)  health and sanitation;
 (E)  public safety;
 (F)  security;
 (G)  fire protection or emergency medical
 services;
 (H)  business recruitment;
 (I)  development;
 (J)  elimination of traffic congestion;
 (K)  recreational, educational, or cultural
 improvements, enhancements, and services; [or]
 (L)  water, wastewater, or drainage facilities or
 services; or
 (M)  any similar public improvement, facility, or
 service.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 3858, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3858.1025 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 3858.1025.  ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. (a)  The district
 may engage in activities that accomplish the economic development
 purposes of the district.
 (b)  The district may establish and provide for the
 administration of one or more programs to promote state or local
 economic development and to stimulate business and commercial
 activity in the district, including programs to:
 (1)  make loans and grants of public money; and
 (2)  provide district personnel and services.
 (c)  The district may create economic development programs
 and exercise the economic development powers that Chapter 380,
 Local Government Code, provides to a municipality.
 SECTION 5.  Section 3858.104(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The district may adopt and enforce rules:
 (1)  to administer or operate the district or any
 service provided by the district;
 (2)  for the use, enjoyment, availability, protection,
 security, and maintenance of the district's property and
 facilities; or
 (3)  to provide for public safety and security in the
 district.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *