E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2671
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4800
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4800
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3452
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3106
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2833
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1505
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1442
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|