E
|
05/15/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
E
|
05/05/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2448
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1270
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1270
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1270
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1265
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 962
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#281
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1644
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#254
|
Journal Page: 1643
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1643
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1643
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 1680
|
Journal Page: 1643
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 261
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 261
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|