LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB2041
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB2041
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB2041
Compare Versions
SB2041 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB2041 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB2041 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB2041 Comm Sub May 15, 2015
SB2041 Engrossed May 5, 2015
SB2041 Comm Sub April 23, 2015
SB2041 Introduced April 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB2041 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB2041 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB2041 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB2041 Comm Sub May 15, 2015
SB2041 Engrossed May 5, 2015
SB2041 Comm Sub April 23, 2015
SB2041 Introduced April 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare