84R12617 JRJ-D By: Schwertner, Kolkhorst S.B. No. 2042 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the board of trustees of the Blinn Junior College District. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 130, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 130.0827 to read as follows: Sec. 130.0827. ADDITIONAL TRUSTEES FOR BLINN JUNIOR COLLEGE DISTRICT. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, in addition to the members of the board of trustees of the Blinn Junior College District elected or appointed under other provisions of this subchapter, the commissioners court of each county in which a branch campus of the district with a student enrollment greater than 10,000 is located shall appoint two members to serve on the district's board of trustees. (b) Members of the board of trustees appointed under this section serve staggered six-year terms, with the term of one member expiring on February 1 every three years. (b-1) In appointing the initial members under this section, the commissioners court shall designate one of the members to serve a term expiring February 1, 2018, and the other member to serve a term expiring February 1, 2021. This subsection expires January 1, 2022. (c) Members of the board of trustees appointed under this section may participate in the decision-making of the board to the same extent as any other member of the board except that members of the board appointed under this section by the commissioners court of a county that is not located in the Blinn Junior College District: (1) may participate in the decision-making of the board only in matters not related to the imposition of a tax or the distribution of revenue raised from a tax; and (2) are counted for purposes of determining whether a quorum of the board is present only for the purpose of Subdivision (1). SECTION 2. The commissioners court of each county to which Section 130.0827, Education Code, as added by this Act, applies shall appoint the initial members of the board of trustees of the Blinn Junior College District under that section not later than December 31, 2015. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.