House | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 4082 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4082 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3109 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1473 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 926 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |