House | 05/26/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1218 | Journal Page: 3843 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Motion to suspend posting rule fails | Journal Page: 3843 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3544 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1338 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2111 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1200 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1202 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1137 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1137 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1137 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1136 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1136 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1136 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1136 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1159 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1092 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1057 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 816 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |