House | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 4082 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4082 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2675 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1437 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Bettencourt | Journal Page: 1367 |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1249 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1054 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |