House | 05/18/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 3785 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3785 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3575 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1617 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/17/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |