E | 06/11/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/11/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3646 | |
E | 05/25/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4467 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2004 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1899 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4139 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | RV#1309 | Journal Page: 4138 |
House | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4138 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4138 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3972 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | RV#1261 | Journal Page: 3972 |
House | 05/21/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3972 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Amendment tabled | 1-Howard | Journal Page: 3969 |
House | 05/21/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3967 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3965 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3845 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3264 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 1514 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1514 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1514 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1514 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1514 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1472 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1472 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 1472 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Menndez | Journal Page: 1472 |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1471 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1471 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 1471 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Point of order | Journal Page: 1471 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1436 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1392 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Tagged | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1157 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1157 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1157 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |