House | 05/23/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4343 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3545 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1598 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1597 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1546 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1196 | |
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |