1 | 1 | | By: Campbell S.B. No. 2071 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed May 6, 2015; May 7, 2015, read first |
---|
3 | 3 | | time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 18, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the dissolution of the Rebecca Creek Municipal Utility |
---|
12 | 12 | | District. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITION; BACKGROUND. (a) In this Act, |
---|
15 | 15 | | "district" means the Rebecca Creek Municipal Utility District. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (b) On or before January 1, 2015, the district's board of |
---|
17 | 17 | | directors sold and transferred substantially all of the district's |
---|
18 | 18 | | water utility system assets and used the proceeds from the sale to |
---|
19 | 19 | | pay, or arrange for the payment of, all debts and liabilities of the |
---|
20 | 20 | | district. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 2. DISTRICT DISSOLUTION. The district's board of |
---|
22 | 22 | | directors may adopt a resolution authorizing the dissolution of the |
---|
23 | 23 | | district, and the district shall be dissolved in accordance with |
---|
24 | 24 | | the terms of that resolution. |
---|
25 | 25 | | SECTION 3. VALIDATION; LIMITATION. (a) The legislature |
---|
26 | 26 | | validates and confirms all governmental acts and proceedings of the |
---|
27 | 27 | | district that were taken before the effective date of this Act. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) This section does not apply to any matter that on the |
---|
29 | 29 | | effective date of this Act: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (1) is involved in litigation if the litigation |
---|
31 | 31 | | ultimately results in the matter being held invalid by a final court |
---|
32 | 32 | | judgment; or |
---|
33 | 33 | | (2) has been held invalid by a final court judgment. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 4. NOTICE. (a) The legal notice of the intention |
---|
35 | 35 | | to introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this |
---|
36 | 36 | | Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a |
---|
37 | 37 | | copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, |
---|
38 | 38 | | officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished |
---|
39 | 39 | | under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, |
---|
40 | 40 | | Government Code. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has |
---|
42 | 42 | | submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on |
---|
43 | 43 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed |
---|
45 | 45 | | its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the |
---|
46 | 46 | | lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
47 | 47 | | representatives within the required time. |
---|
48 | 48 | | (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this |
---|
49 | 49 | | state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect |
---|
50 | 50 | | to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled |
---|
51 | 51 | | and accomplished. |
---|
52 | 52 | | SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
53 | 53 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
54 | 54 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
55 | 55 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
56 | 56 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
57 | 57 | | * * * * * |
---|