House | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3907 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1850 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1734 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1585 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |