LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB208
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB208
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB208
Compare Versions
SB208 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB208 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB208 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB208 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
SB208 Engrossed May 11, 2015
SB208 Comm Sub April 30, 2015
SB208 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB208 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB208 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB208 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB208 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
SB208 Engrossed May 11, 2015
SB208 Comm Sub April 30, 2015
SB208 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare