Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB209 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hinojosa, et al. S.B. No. 209
22 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2015; March 2, 2015, read
33 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
44 Economic Development; March 11, 2015, reported favorably by the
55 following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; March 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
66 Click here to see the committee vote
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Workforce
1212 Investment Council, including assumption of the duties of the Texas
1313 Skill Standards Board.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Section 2308.005, Government Code, is amended to
1616 read as follows:
1717 Sec. 2308.005. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas
1818 Workforce Investment Council is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas
1919 Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by that
2020 chapter, the council is abolished September 1, 2027 [2015]. The
2121 council shall be reviewed during the period in which the Texas
2222 Workforce Commission is reviewed.
2323 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 2308, Government Code, is
2424 amended by adding Section 2308.109 to read as follows:
2525 Sec. 2308.109. DUTY TO DEVELOP SKILL STANDARDS. (a) The
2626 council shall provide advice to the governor and the legislature on
2727 the development of a statewide system of industry-defined and
2828 industry-recognized skill standards and credentials for all major
2929 skilled occupations that:
3030 (1) provide strong employment and earnings
3131 opportunities in this state; and
3232 (2) require less than a baccalaureate degree.
3333 (b) The council shall:
3434 (1) validate and recognize nationally established
3535 skill standards to guide curriculum development, training,
3636 assessment, and certification of workforce skills;
3737 (2) convene industry groups to develop skill standards
3838 and certification procedures for industries and occupations in
3939 which standards have not been established or adopted and recognize
4040 the skill standards and certification procedures;
4141 (3) review the standards developed by other states and
4242 foreign countries and enter into agreements for mutual recognition
4343 of standards and credentials to enhance portability of skills; and
4444 (4) promote the use of standards and credentials among
4545 employers.
4646 (c) The council shall:
4747 (1) report on the council's duties under this section
4848 to the governor; and
4949 (2) provide annual reports on the council's duties
5050 under this section to the governor, the division, and the
5151 legislature.
5252 SECTION 3. Subchapter H, Chapter 2308, Government Code, is
5353 repealed.
5454 SECTION 4. The Texas Skill Standards Board is abolished.
5555 All powers and duties of the Texas Skill Standards Board are
5656 transferred to the Texas Workforce Investment Council.
5757 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
5858 * * * * *