House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1826 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1057 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 635 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 635 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |