Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB218 Introduced / Analysis

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 218     84R13945 MCK-D   By: Nelson         State Affairs         3/26/2015         As Filed    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 218
84R13945 MCK-D By: Nelson
 State Affairs
 3/26/2015
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 218

84R13945 MCK-D

By: Nelson

 

State Affairs

 

3/26/2015

 

As Filed

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   State agencies undergo periodic review by the Sunset Advisory Commission (Sunset). The legislature frequently changes the review schedule for certain agencies to balance the workload of Sunset and to better align the reviews of agencies by grouping them based on subject matter. S.B. 218 serves this purpose of better aligning and grouping agencies set for sunset review in upcoming bienniums. The bill also removes one entity from the sunset review schedule.   As proposed, S.B. 218 amends current law relating to governmental entities subject to the sunset review process.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.    SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   ARTICLE 1. ENTITIES GIVEN 2019 SUNSET DATE   SECTION 1.01. CREDIT UNION DEPARTMENT AND CREDIT UNION COMMISSION. Amends Section 15.212, Finance Code, as follows:   Sec. 15.212. SUNSET PROVISION. Provides that, unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the Credit Union Department and the Credit Union Commission are abolished September 1, 2019, rather than September 1, 2021.   ARTICLE 2. ENTITIES GIVEN 2021 SUNSET DATE   SECTION 2.01 TEXAS FACILITIES COMMISSION. Amends Section 2152.002, Government Code, as follows:   Sec. 2152.002. SUNSET PROVISION. Provides that, unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the Texas Facilities Commission is abolished and this subtitle, except for Chapter 2170 (Telecommunications Services) and Section 2157.121 (Acquisition Through Competitive Sealed Proposals), expires September 1, 2021, rather than September 1, 2015.     ARTICLE 3. ENTITIES REMOVED FROM SPECIFIC SUNSET REVIEW   SECTION 3.01. SULPHUR RIVER BASIN AUTHORITY. Repealer: Section 1A (creation of the Sulphur River Basin Authority), Chapter 3, Acts of the 69th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 1985.    ARTICLE 4. EFFECTIVE DATE.   SECTION 4.01. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015.  

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

State agencies undergo periodic review by the Sunset Advisory Commission (Sunset). The legislature frequently changes the review schedule for certain agencies to balance the workload of Sunset and to better align the reviews of agencies by grouping them based on subject matter. S.B. 218 serves this purpose of better aligning and grouping agencies set for sunset review in upcoming bienniums. The bill also removes one entity from the sunset review schedule.

 

As proposed, S.B. 218 amends current law relating to governmental entities subject to the sunset review process.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency. 

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

ARTICLE 1. ENTITIES GIVEN 2019 SUNSET DATE

 

SECTION 1.01. CREDIT UNION DEPARTMENT AND CREDIT UNION COMMISSION. Amends Section 15.212, Finance Code, as follows:

 

Sec. 15.212. SUNSET PROVISION. Provides that, unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the Credit Union Department and the Credit Union Commission are abolished September 1, 2019, rather than September 1, 2021.

 

ARTICLE 2. ENTITIES GIVEN 2021 SUNSET DATE

 

SECTION 2.01 TEXAS FACILITIES COMMISSION. Amends Section 2152.002, Government Code, as follows:

 

Sec. 2152.002. SUNSET PROVISION. Provides that, unless continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the Texas Facilities Commission is abolished and this subtitle, except for Chapter 2170 (Telecommunications Services) and Section 2157.121 (Acquisition Through Competitive Sealed Proposals), expires September 1, 2021, rather than September 1, 2015. 

 

 ARTICLE 3. ENTITIES REMOVED FROM SPECIFIC SUNSET REVIEW

 

SECTION 3.01. SULPHUR RIVER BASIN AUTHORITY. Repealer: Section 1A (creation of the Sulphur River Basin Authority), Chapter 3, Acts of the 69th Legislature, 1st Called Session, 1985. 

 

ARTICLE 4. EFFECTIVE DATE.

 

SECTION 4.01. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015.