E | 05/15/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/15/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1626 | |
E | 05/05/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1340 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2476 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1313 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1262 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#448 | Journal Page: 2147 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2118 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2118 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1045 | Journal Page: 2118 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2002 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2002 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 856 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 345 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 145 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 145 | |
Senate | 12/03/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/03/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |