Senate | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 706 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 175 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 145 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 145 | |
Senate | 01/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 87 | |
Senate | 12/09/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/09/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |