E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5210
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2677
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2677
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2677
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1963
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4247
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1358
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amended
|
1-T. King
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/23/15 2:10 PM
|
Journal Page: 4239
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4239
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
5-T. King
|
Journal Page: 4180
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Dale
|
Journal Page: 4179
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4179
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/22/15 4:25 PM
|
Journal Page: 4171
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Dale
|
Journal Page: 4164
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 571
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 357
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 149
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 149
|
Senate
|
12/19/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|