House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4702
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1534
|
Journal Page: 4702
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Failed to pass to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4702
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Anchia
|
Journal Page: 4701
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4701
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/26/15 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/24/15 6:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/23/15 6:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/20/15 6:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3817
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3816
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/19/15 6:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3715
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3715
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/18/15 6:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3191
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3191
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 559
|
Journal Page: 3191
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 977
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 977
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 977
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 977
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 925
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 149
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 149
|
Senate
|
12/19/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|