Senate | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 268 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 149 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 149 | |
Senate | 12/22/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/22/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |