E
|
06/18/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3140
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4674
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1509
|
Journal Page: 4673
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4673
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4672
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Burkett
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3845
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 712
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 150
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 150
|
Senate
|
01/07/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|