Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB277 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 277
 (In the Senate - Filed January 7, 2015; January 28, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 31, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 March 31, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 277 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the abolition of certain health-related task forces and
 advisory committees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The Interagency Task Force on Electronic
 Benefits Transfers is abolished.
 (b)  Section 531.045, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The Medicaid and Public Assistance Fraud
 Oversight Task Force is abolished.
 (b)  Section 22.028(c), Human Resources Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  No later than the first day of each month, the
 department shall send the comptroller a report listing the accounts
 on which enforcement actions or other steps were taken by the
 department in response to the records received from the EBT
 operator under this section, and the action taken by the
 department. The comptroller shall promptly review the report and,
 as appropriate, may solicit the advice of the office of the
 inspector general [Medicaid and Public Assistance Fraud Oversight
 Task Force] regarding the results of the department's enforcement
 actions.
 (c)  Section 531.107, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  The Advisory Committee on Inpatient Mental
 Health Services is abolished.
 (b)  Section 571.027, Health and Safety Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  (a) The Interagency Inspection Task Force is
 abolished.
 (b)  Section 42.0442(c), Human Resources Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  [The interagency task force shall establish an
 inspection checklist based on the inspection protocol developed
 under Subsection (b).] Each state agency that inspects a facility
 listed in Subsection (a) shall use an [the] inspection checklist
 established by the department in performing an inspection. A state
 agency shall make a copy of the completed inspection checklist
 available to the facility at the facility's request to assist the
 facility in maintaining records.
 (c)  Section 42.0442(b), Human Resources Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 5.  If an entity that is abolished by this Act has
 property, records, or other assets, the Health and Human Services
 Commission shall take custody of the entity's property, records, or
 other assets.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *