House
|
05/26/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2671
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2671
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2673
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1335
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1127
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 150
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 150
|
Senate
|
01/07/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|