LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB287
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB287
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB287
Compare Versions
SB287 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB287 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB287 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB287 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
SB287 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB287 Comm Sub March 16, 2015
SB287 Introduced January 8, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB287 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB287 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB287 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB287 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
SB287 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB287 Comm Sub March 16, 2015
SB287 Introduced January 8, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare