House | 05/29/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/25/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 984 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 574 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 523 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 522 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Estes | Journal Page: 522 |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 522 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 522 | |
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 151 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 151 | |
Senate | 01/08/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/08/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |