E
|
06/19/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5208
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1964
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1343
|
Journal Page: 4229
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4229
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4229
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4159
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3845
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2260
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 632
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 632
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 632
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 632
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 632
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 631
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 158
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 158
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|