House | 05/19/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3845 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3642 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1844 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1051 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1051 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1051 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1051 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1050 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1050 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 159 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 159 | |
Senate | 01/16/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/16/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |