House | 05/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3896 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3105 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3105 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2137 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |