E
|
06/01/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3814
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1203
|
Journal Page: 3814
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3814
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3813
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3813
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3739
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3739
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1182
|
Journal Page: 3738
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3738
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Moody
|
Journal Page: 3735
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3729
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3105
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2808
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1445
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1404
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 925
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 327
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 250
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 250
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 161
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 161
|
Senate
|
01/23/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|