Senate | 02/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 193 | |
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 185 | |
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 162 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 162 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 152 | |
Senate | 01/23/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |