Senate | 03/03/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 327 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 250 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 250 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 162 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 162 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 152 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |