Senate | 03/30/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 637 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 451 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 163 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 163 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |