Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB363 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Fraser S.B. No. 363
2- (Murr)
1+S.B. No. 363
32
43
5- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
64 AN ACT
75 relating to the election dates for directors of the Bandera County
86 River Authority and Groundwater District.
97 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
108 SECTION 1. Chapter 654, Acts of the 71st Legislature,
119 Regular Session, 1989, is amended by adding Section 1A and amending
1210 Section 10 to read as follows:
1311 Sec. 1A. REFERENCE IN LAW MEANING BANDERA COUNTY RIVER
1412 AUTHORITY AND GROUNDWATER DISTRICT. The district name is the
1513 Bandera County River Authority and Groundwater District. A
1614 reference in law to the Springhills Water Management District means
1715 the Bandera County River Authority and Groundwater District.
1816 Sec. 10. ELECTION OF DIRECTORS. (a) Directors serve
1917 staggered four-year terms.
2018 (b) Every two years [On the first Saturday in May of the
2119 second year after the year in which the district is authorized to be
2220 created at a confirmation election,] an election shall be held in
2321 the district on the uniform election date in November for the
2422 election of the appropriate number of directors. Two directors
2523 shall be elected from each commissioner precinct and one director
2624 shall be elected at large. The director elected from each
2725 commissioner precinct who receives the fewer number of votes shall
2826 serve a two-year term, and the director elected from each
2927 commissioner precinct who receives the most votes and the director
3028 elected at large shall serve a four-year term. Thereafter, on the
3129 same date in each subsequent second year, the appropriate number of
3230 directors shall be elected to the board.
3331 SECTION 2. The term of a director elected to the board of
3432 the Bandera County River Authority and Groundwater District in May
3533 2013 expires on December 1, 2016, and the term of a director elected
3634 to the board in May 2015 expires December 1, 2018.
3735 SECTION 3. (a) The legislature finds that the Bandera
3836 County River Authority and Groundwater District was originally
3937 created by Chapter 629, Acts of the 62nd Legislature, Regular
4038 Session, 1971, as the Bandera County River Authority, and then
4139 modified or merged by Chapter 654, Acts of the 71st Legislature,
4240 Regular Session, 1989, as the Springhills Water Management
4341 District.
4442 (b) The legislature further finds that the Springhills
4543 Water Management District was renamed the Bandera County River
4644 Authority and Groundwater District in 2003.
4745 SECTION 4. (a) The legal notice of the intention to
4846 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
4947 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
5048 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
5149 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
5250 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
5351 Government Code.
5452 (b) The governor has submitted the notice and Act to the
5553 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
5654 (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
5755 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
5856 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
5957 representatives within the required time.
6058 (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
6159 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
6260 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
6361 and accomplished.
6462 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
63+ ______________________________ ______________________________
64+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
65+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 363 passed the Senate on
66+ April 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
67+ ______________________________
68+ Secretary of the Senate
69+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 363 passed the House on
70+ May 19, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, two
71+ present not voting.
72+ ______________________________
73+ Chief Clerk of the House
74+ Approved:
75+ ______________________________
76+ Date
77+ ______________________________
78+ Governor