E
|
06/10/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/10/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
E
|
05/22/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1946
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3922
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1240
|
Journal Page: 3922
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3922
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3922
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1229
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2062
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1161
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Garcia
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1105
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 163
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 163
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|