E | 06/19/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3648 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5692 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3503 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3439 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 5210 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2676 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 2676 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 2676 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2675 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4227 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#1340 | Journal Page: 4227 |
House | 05/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4227 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4227 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4158 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4158 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3845 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2137 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 91 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |