Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB373 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 373
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 9, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 9, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increased oversight by the Department of State Health
 Services of hospitals that commit certain violations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 241.0555 to read as follows:
 Sec. 241.0555.  ADDITIONAL REQUIREMENTS: POTENTIALLY
 PREVENTABLE ADVERSE EVENTS. (a) If the department finds that a
 hospital has committed a violation that resulted in a potentially
 preventable adverse event reportable under Chapter 98, the
 department shall require the hospital to develop and implement a
 plan for approval by the department to address the deficiencies
 that may have contributed to the preventable adverse event.
 (b)  The department may require the plan under this section
 to include:
 (1)  staff training and education;
 (2)  supervision requirements for certain staff;
 (3)  increased staffing requirements;
 (4)  increased reporting to the department; and
 (5)  a review and amendment of hospital policies
 relating to patient safety.
 (c)  The department shall carefully and frequently monitor
 the hospital's adherence to the plan under this section and enforce
 compliance.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 potentially preventable adverse event that occurs on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *