LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB373
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB373
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB373
Compare Versions
SB373 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB373 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB373 Enrolled May 19, 2015
SB373 Comm Sub May 5, 2015
SB373 Engrossed March 23, 2015
SB373 Comm Sub March 9, 2015
SB373 Introduced January 28, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB373 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB373 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB373 Enrolled May 19, 2015
SB373 Comm Sub May 5, 2015
SB373 Engrossed March 23, 2015
SB373 Comm Sub March 9, 2015
SB373 Introduced January 28, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare