Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB373 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/19/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 373


 AN ACT
 relating to increased oversight by the Department of State Health
 Services of hospitals that commit certain violations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as the Margaret Joy Thomas
 Act.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 241.0555 to read as follows:
 Sec. 241.0555.  ADDITIONAL REQUIREMENTS: POTENTIALLY
 PREVENTABLE ADVERSE EVENTS. (a)  If the department finds that a
 hospital has committed a violation that resulted in a potentially
 preventable adverse event reportable under Chapter 98, the
 department shall require the hospital to develop and implement a
 plan for approval by the department to address the deficiencies
 that may have contributed to the preventable adverse event.
 (b)  The department may require the plan under this section
 to include:
 (1)  staff training and education;
 (2)  supervision requirements for certain staff;
 (3)  increased staffing requirements;
 (4)  increased reporting to the department; and
 (5)  a review and amendment of hospital policies
 relating to patient safety.
 (c)  The department shall carefully and frequently monitor
 the hospital's adherence to the plan under this section and enforce
 compliance.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 potentially preventable adverse event that occurs on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 373 passed the Senate on
 March 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 19, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 373 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 13, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 81,
 Nays 58, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor