1 | 1 | | 84R5106 JRJ-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: RodrÃguez S.B. No. 406 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to reforming the electoral process; creating a criminal |
---|
8 | 8 | | offense. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 1, Election Code, is amended by adding |
---|
11 | 11 | | Section 1.021 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 1.021. BIPARTISAN ELECTION COMMISSION. (a) The |
---|
13 | 13 | | Bipartisan Election Commission is composed of eight members as |
---|
14 | 14 | | follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) two members from each political party whose |
---|
16 | 16 | | nominee for governor in the most recent gubernatorial general |
---|
17 | 17 | | election received 20 percent or more of the total number of votes |
---|
18 | 18 | | received by all candidates for governor in the election, appointed |
---|
19 | 19 | | by the senate; and |
---|
20 | 20 | | (2) two members from each political party whose |
---|
21 | 21 | | nominee for governor in the most recent gubernatorial general |
---|
22 | 22 | | election received 20 percent or more of the total number of votes |
---|
23 | 23 | | received by all candidates for governor in the election, appointed |
---|
24 | 24 | | by the house of representatives. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (b) A member of the commission serves at the will of the |
---|
26 | 26 | | appointing house of the legislature. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (c) The commission shall: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (1) study methods to reduce election fraud, increase |
---|
29 | 29 | | voter turnout, and improve election practices in this state; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | (2) monitor the implementation of the changes in law |
---|
31 | 31 | | made to Chapter 63 regarding the procedures for accepting a voter. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (d) The commission shall report its findings to the |
---|
33 | 33 | | committees of each house of the legislature with jurisdiction over |
---|
34 | 34 | | elections. The commission shall submit one report not later than |
---|
35 | 35 | | December 1, 2016, and a second report not later than December 1, |
---|
36 | 36 | | 2018. This subsection expires September 1, 2019. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 31, Election Code, is |
---|
38 | 38 | | amended by adding Sections 31.013 and 31.014 to read as follows: |
---|
39 | 39 | | Sec. 31.013. ELECTION INTEGRITY TRAINING. The secretary of |
---|
40 | 40 | | state and the attorney general jointly shall annually conduct, in |
---|
41 | 41 | | at least four different geographic regions of the state, election |
---|
42 | 42 | | integrity training for election officers, law enforcement |
---|
43 | 43 | | personnel, and prosecutors in methods of detecting, investigating, |
---|
44 | 44 | | and prosecuting instances of voter fraud and voter suppression. |
---|
45 | 45 | | Sec. 31.014. PHOTO IDENTIFICATION ACCESS STUDY. (a) Not |
---|
46 | 46 | | later than January 1, 2017, the secretary of state shall conduct a |
---|
47 | 47 | | study on the availability of photo identification and provide |
---|
48 | 48 | | recommendations to the legislature concerning: |
---|
49 | 49 | | (1) the ability to merge the databases of different |
---|
50 | 50 | | state agencies and governmental entities to obtain photographs of |
---|
51 | 51 | | voters for use on the voter's voter registration certificate; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | (2) ways to make photo identification available at no |
---|
53 | 53 | | cost to as many voters as possible, including the use of a program |
---|
54 | 54 | | to obtain photographs of voters using neighborhood mobile units for |
---|
55 | 55 | | use on the voter's voter registration certificate. |
---|
56 | 56 | | (b) This section expires September 1, 2017. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 3. Chapter 61, Election Code, is amended by adding |
---|
58 | 58 | | Subchapter C to read as follows: |
---|
59 | 59 | | SUBCHAPTER C. DECEPTIVE ELECTION PRACTICES AND VOTER SUPPRESSION |
---|
60 | 60 | | Sec. 61.061. DECEPTIVE ELECTION PRACTICES AND VOTER |
---|
61 | 61 | | SUPPRESSION PROHIBITED. A person may not knowingly deceive another |
---|
62 | 62 | | person regarding: |
---|
63 | 63 | | (1) the time, place, or manner of conducting an |
---|
64 | 64 | | election in this state; or |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) the qualifications for or restrictions governing |
---|
66 | 66 | | voter eligibility for an election in this state. |
---|
67 | 67 | | Sec. 61.062. CRIMINAL OFFENSE. (a) A person commits an |
---|
68 | 68 | | offense if the person violates Section 61.061 with the intent to |
---|
69 | 69 | | prevent another person from: |
---|
70 | 70 | | (1) voting in an election; or |
---|
71 | 71 | | (2) casting a ballot that may legally be counted. |
---|
72 | 72 | | (b) An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor. |
---|
73 | 73 | | Sec. 61.063. REPORT TO SECRETARY OF STATE; ACTION BY |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECRETARY. (a) A person may report a suspected violation of |
---|
75 | 75 | | Section 61.061 to the secretary of state through the voting rights |
---|
76 | 76 | | hotline or otherwise. |
---|
77 | 77 | | (b) Not later than 48 hours after receiving the report, the |
---|
78 | 78 | | secretary of state shall: |
---|
79 | 79 | | (1) refer the matter to the attorney general as |
---|
80 | 80 | | provided by Section 31.006 if the secretary determines that there |
---|
81 | 81 | | is reasonable cause to suspect that a criminal offense has been |
---|
82 | 82 | | committed; and |
---|
83 | 83 | | (2) take any action determined necessary to provide |
---|
84 | 84 | | correct information to the voters affected by the violation. |
---|
85 | 85 | | (c) The secretary of state shall adopt rules regarding the |
---|
86 | 86 | | method of taking corrective action under Subsection (b)(2). |
---|
87 | 87 | | Sec. 61.064. REPORT TO LEGISLATURE. (a) Not later than |
---|
88 | 88 | | February 1 of each year, the secretary of state shall submit a |
---|
89 | 89 | | report to the legislature regarding the reported violations of |
---|
90 | 90 | | Section 61.061 during the preceding calendar year. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (b) The report must include: |
---|
92 | 92 | | (1) the number of reports of violations received; |
---|
93 | 93 | | (2) the number of alleged violations referred to the |
---|
94 | 94 | | attorney general; |
---|
95 | 95 | | (3) a description of the corrective actions taken |
---|
96 | 96 | | under Section 61.063(b)(2); |
---|
97 | 97 | | (4) the geographic locations of and populations |
---|
98 | 98 | | affected by the alleged violations; and |
---|
99 | 99 | | (5) any other information considered appropriate by |
---|
100 | 100 | | the secretary of state. |
---|
101 | 101 | | (c) The secretary of state may withhold specific |
---|
102 | 102 | | information from a report under this section if the secretary |
---|
103 | 103 | | determines that the disclosure of that information would unduly |
---|
104 | 104 | | interfere with an ongoing investigation. |
---|
105 | 105 | | SECTION 4. Subchapter A, Chapter 273, Election Code, is |
---|
106 | 106 | | amended by adding Section 273.005 to read as follows: |
---|
107 | 107 | | Sec. 273.005. POST-ELECTION INTEGRITY AUDIT. (a) |
---|
108 | 108 | | Following the general election for state and county officers, the |
---|
109 | 109 | | county clerk of each county shall conduct a post-election integrity |
---|
110 | 110 | | audit to examine and investigate any evidence of voter fraud or |
---|
111 | 111 | | voter suppression. |
---|
112 | 112 | | (b) The county clerk shall: |
---|
113 | 113 | | (1) not later than the 90th day after the date of the |
---|
114 | 114 | | general election for state and county officers, file a report with |
---|
115 | 115 | | the secretary of state and the commissioners court of the county |
---|
116 | 116 | | providing details of the evidence collected in the audit; and |
---|
117 | 117 | | (2) refer any evidence of voter fraud or voter |
---|
118 | 118 | | suppression collected under the audit to the district attorney or |
---|
119 | 119 | | criminal district attorney with jurisdiction in the county. |
---|
120 | 120 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|