E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1293
|
Journal Page: 4115
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4115
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4115
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4096
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4096
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2448
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1280
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 183
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 183
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|