House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1940
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 786
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 786
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 786
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 786
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 785
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 785
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 785
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 785
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 785
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 785
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 183
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 183
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|