Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB413 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2015

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 413
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2015; February 4, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water,
 and Rural Affairs; April 7, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 413 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications for membership on the Texas Water
 Development Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 6.052(a) and (b), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board is composed of three members who are appointed
 by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate. One
 member must have experience in the field of engineering, one member
 must have experience in the field of public or private finance, and
 one member must:
 (1)  be actively engaged in the business of farming or
 animal husbandry or another business related to agriculture; and
 (2)  wholly or partly own or lease land used in
 connection with a business described by Subdivision (1) [have
 experience in the field of law or business].
 (b)  The governor shall make the appointments in such a
 manner that the members:
 (1)  reflect the diverse geographic regions and
 population groups of this state, provided that one member resides
 in a rural area and is a registered voter of a county with a
 population of less than 355,000; and
 (2)  do not have any conflicts of interest prohibited
 by state or federal law.
 SECTION 2.  Section 6.054, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(2), a board member who
 resided in a county with a population of less than 355,000 at the
 time the member was appointed may not be removed on the ground that
 the population of the county no longer meets that requirement.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act relating to
 the qualifications for membership on the Texas Water Development
 Board do not affect the eligibility of a member of the board serving
 immediately before the effective date of this Act to continue to
 serve on the board for the term to which the member was appointed.
 Not later than February 1, 2019, the governor shall appoint members
 of the board as necessary to ensure that the composition of the
 board complies with Section 6.052, Water Code, as amended by this
 Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *