Senate | 04/08/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 01/30/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |