Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB420 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2015

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 420
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2015; February 4, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 31, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 31, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 420 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a campus of the Texas State Technical
 College System in Ellis County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 135.02(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas State Technical College System is composed of:
 (1)  a system office located in the city of Waco in
 McLennan County;
 (2)  a campus located in the city of Harlingen in
 Cameron County;
 (3)  a campus serving West Texas that operates as a
 collective unit of strategically positioned permanent locations in
 the city of Sweetwater in Nolan County, the city of Abilene in
 Taylor County, the city of Brownwood in Brown County, and the city
 of Breckenridge in Stephens County;
 (4)  a campus located in the city of Marshall in
 Harrison County;
 (5)  a campus located in the city of Waco in McLennan
 County;
 (6)  a campus [an extension center] located in the city
 of Red Oak in Ellis County; and
 (7)  campuses assigned to the system from time to time
 by specific legislative Act.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *