House
|
05/26/2015
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 18 and Rule 4, Section 32
|
Journal Page: 4692
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4692
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/25/15 6:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4514
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4514
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Article III, Section 5
|
Journal Page: 4491
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4491
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 856
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 502
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 431
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 430
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 430
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 430
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 451
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 313
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 268
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 184
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 184
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|