House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3642
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 572
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 502
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 357
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 190
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 190
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|