E | 05/28/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3103 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1741 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1690 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1202 | Journal Page: 3812 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3812 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3812 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3727 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Simpson | Journal Page: 3725 |
House | 05/18/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3725 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/18/15 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 3204 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3204 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1955 | Journal Page: 3204 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1028 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 616 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 560 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Perry | Journal Page: 559 |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 559 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |